Wong, Samuel (CPSO#: 66512)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1993

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jul 1997

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1993

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
291 Davis Drive
Suite 7
Newmarket ON  L3Y 2N6
Phone: (905) 898-5777
Fax: (905) 898-7665
Electoral District: 05
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

3-205 Marycroft
Woodbridge ON  L4L 5X7
Canada
Phone: (905) 265-8870
Fax: (905) 265-8871
County: Regional Municipality of York
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Samuel Wong Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Oct 18 2012

Shareholders:
Dr. S. Wong ( CPSO# 66512 )

Business Address:
291 Davis Drive
Suite 7
Newmarket ON  L3Y 2N6
Phone Number: (905) 898-5777

Business Address:
3-205 Marycroft Avenue
Woodbridge ON  L4L 5X7
Phone Number: (905) 265-8870

Business Address:
596 Davis Drive
Newmarket ON  L3Y 2P9
Phone Number: (905) 895-4521

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Southlake Regional Health Centre Newmarket

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Physical Medicine and Rehabilitation Effective: 30 Jun 1997 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. SAMUEL WONG may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. WONG is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1993 to 30 Jun 1994
PostGrad Yr 1 - Physical Medicine and Rehabilitation

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1994 to 30 Jun 1995
Resident 2 - Physical Medicine and Rehabilitation

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
Resident 3 - Physical Medicine and Rehabilitation

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
Resident 4 - Physical Medicine and Rehabilitation

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
Clinical Fellow - Physical Medicine and Rehabilitation

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1993
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jul 1997