Wong, Victor Choon Hoe (CPSO#: 71102)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1997

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 1999

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Cantonese, English

Education:University of Ottawa, 1997

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 4
3095 Glen Erin Drive
Mississauga ON  L5L 1J3
Phone: (905) 820-1046
Fax: (905) 820-1899
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Victor Choon Hoe Wong Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Dec 06 2007

Shareholders:
Dr. V. Wong ( CPSO# 71102 )

Business Address:
Suite 4
3095 Glen Erin Drive
Mississauga ON  L5L 1J3
Phone Number: (905) 820-1046

Business Address:
200 Main Street East
Hamilton ON  L8N 1H3
Phone Number: (905) 523-4567

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Trillium Health Partners,The Credit Valley Hospital Mississauga

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 17 Jun 1999 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. VICTOR CHOON HOE WONG may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. WONG is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1997
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 1999