Woo, Elaine Kin Jen (CPSO#: 61107)

Current Status: Active Member as of 15 Jun 1989

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 09 Jul 1990

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Saskatchewan, 1989

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 212
250 Harding Boulevard West
Richmond Hill ON  L4C 9M7
Phone: (905) 883-0338
Fax: (905) 883-6109
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Elaine K. J. Woo Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Mar 30 2006

Shareholders:
Dr. E. Woo ( CPSO# 61107 )

Business Address:
212 - 250 Harding Boulevard West
Richmond Hill ON  L4C 9M7
Phone Number: (905) 883-0338

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Mackenzie Health,Richmond Hill Richmond Hill
Markham Stouffville Hospital Markham
Southlake Regional Health Centre Newmarket
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Ophthalmology Effective: 27 Jun 1996 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ELAINE KIN JEN WOO may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. WOO is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1994 to 30 Jun 1995
Resident 4 - Ophthalmology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
Clinical Fellow - Ophthalmology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1989
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 09 Jul 1990