Woo, Vincent Linkwong (CPSO#: 70131)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1996

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2001

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1996

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Glenrose Rehabilitation Hospital
10230-111 Ave NW
Edmonton AB  T5G 0B7
Phone: 780-735-7914 Ext. 33235
Fax: 780-735-8846
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Vincent L. Woo Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jul 05 2011

Shareholders:
Dr. V. Woo ( CPSO# 70131 )

Business Address:
80 Workman Way
Toronto ON  M6J 1H4
Phone Number: (416) 535-8501

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

Alberta

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Centre for Addiction & Mental Health,Queen Street Site Toronto
Centre of Addiction & Mental Health,- College Street Site Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective: 30 Jun 2001 RCPSC Specialist
Geriatric Psychiatry Effective: 26 Sep 2013 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. VINCENT LINKWONG WOO may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. WOO is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
PostGrad Yr 1 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
PostGrad Yr 2 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
PostGrad Yr 3 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1999 to 30 Jun 2000
PostGrad Yr 4 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2000 to 30 Jun 2001
PostGrad Yr 5 - Psychiatry

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1996
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2001