Woodend, Dianne Michelle (CPSO#: 84400)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2006

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 25 Jun 2008

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Ottawa, 2006

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Primacy Family First Health Centre
Department of Family Medicine
4270 Innes Road
Orleans ON  K4A 5E6
Phone: (613) 841-7009
Electoral District: 07
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Woodend Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Nov 13 2008

Shareholders:
Dr. D. Woodend ( CPSO# 84400 )

Business Address:
Primacy Family First Health Centre
4270 Innes Road
Orleans ON  K4A 5E6
Phone Number: (613) 841-7009

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 20 Jun 2008 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. DIANNE MICHELLE WOODEND may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. WOODEND is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2006
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 25 Jun 2008