Woolnough, Rebecca Jane (CPSO#: 95994)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2011

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2015

Summary

Former Name: Glassford, Rebecca Jane (used until: 25 Sep 2013 )

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of British Columbia, 2011

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
QHC Regional Paediatric Services
Consulting Group
274 Dundas Street East, Suite 303/5
Belleville ON  K8N 1E6
Phone: (613) 779-7575
Fax: 613-779-8686
Electoral District: 06
Find more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

8 Richmond Park Drive
Napanee ON  K7R 2B5
Canada
Phone: 613-345-3301
County: County of Lennox and Addington
Electoral District: 06

L&A General Hospital
8 Richmond Park Drive
Napanee ON  K7R 2B5
Canada
Phone: 613-345-3301
County: County of Lennox and Addington
Electoral District: 06

Kingston Family Health Team
797 Princess Street
Kingston ON  K7L 1G1
Canada
Phone: 613-531-4234
County: County of Frontenac
Electoral District: 06

797 Princess Street
Kingston ON  K7L 1G1
Canada
Phone: 613-549-0464
Fax: 613-549-0490
County: County of Frontenac
Electoral District: 06

265 Dundas St East
Belleville, ON
Belleville ON  K8N 5A9
Canada
Phone: 613-969-7400
County: County of Hastings
Electoral District: 06

730 Front Rd, Unit 7
Kingston ON  K7M 6P7
Canada
Phone: (613) 384-7640
Fax: (613) 634-8595
County: County of Frontenac
Electoral District: 06
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Rebecca Woolnough Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  May 14 2015

Shareholders:
Dr. R. Woolnough ( CPSO# 95994 )
Dr. N. Woolnough ( CPSO# 101296)

Business Address:
303 - 274 Dundas Street East
Belleville ON  K8N 1E6
Phone Number: (613) 779-7575

Business Address:
797 Princess Street
Kingston ON  K7L 1G1
Phone Number: (613) 531-4234

Business Address:
7 - 730 Front Road
Kingston ON  K7M 6P7
Phone Number: (613) 384-7640

Business Address:
QHC Bellevlle General Hospital
Department of Pediatrics
265 Dundas Street East
Belleville ON  K8N 5A9
Phone Number: (613) 969-7400

Business Address:
L&A General Hospital
8 Richmond Park Drive
Napanee ON  K7R 2B5
Phone Number: (613) 354-3301

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Kingston Health Sciences Centre Kingston
Lennox and Addington County General Hospital Napanee
Quinte Healthcare,Belleville General Site Belleville

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Pediatrics Effective: 30 Jun 2015 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. REBECCA JANE WOOLNOUGH may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. WOOLNOUGH is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 1 - Pediatrics

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 2 - Pediatrics

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 3 - Pediatrics

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 4 - Pediatrics

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2011
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2015