Workman, Charles Murray (CPSO#: 32568)

Current Status: Active Member as of 29 Jun 1981

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 29 Jun 1981

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 1980

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Paterson Medical Centre
45 Wolsley Street
Kenora ON  P9N 3W7
Phone: (807) 468-3021
Fax: (807) 468-6964
Electoral District: 09
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Murray Workman Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jan 31 2008

Shareholders:
Dr. C. Workman ( CPSO# 32568 )

Business Address:
Lake of the Woods District Hospital
21 Sylvan Street
Kenora ON  P9N 3W7
Phone Number: (807) 468-9861

Business Address:
Patterson Medical Centre
45 Wolsley Street
Kenora ON  P9N 3W7
Phone Number: (807) 468-3021

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Lake of the Woods District Hospital Kenora

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. CHARLES MURRAY WORKMAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. WORKMAN is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1993 to 30 Jun 1994
Resident 1 - Anesthesiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 16 Jun 1980
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 29 Jun 1981