Wozniak, Ewa Aleksandra (CPSO#: 74022)

Current Status: Active Member as of 28 Jul 2005

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 28 Jul 2005

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Polish

Education:Dalhousie University, 1994

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Department of Lab Medicine
Royal Victoria Hospital
201 Georgian Drive
Barrie ON  L4M 6M2
Phone: (705) 728-9090 Ext. 43202
Fax: (705) 739-5685
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Ewa Wozniak Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Aug 05 2011

Shareholders:
Dr. E. Wozniak ( CPSO# 74022 )

Business Address:
Department of Lab Medicine
Royal Victoria Hospital
201 Georgian Drive
Barrie ON  L4M 6M2
Phone Number: (705) 728-9090

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Collingwood General and Marine Hospital Collingwood
Georgian Bay General Hospital Midland
Royal Victoria Regional Health Centre Barrie

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
General Pathology Effective: 31 May 2000 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. EWA ALEKSANDRA WOZNIAK may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. WOZNIAK is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1999 to 30 Jun 2000
Clinical Fellow - Anatomical Pathology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1999
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2000
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 28 Jul 2005