Wozniak, Peter Conrad (CPSO#: 59542)

Current Status: Active Member as of 15 Jun 1988

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 28 Jun 1989

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Ottawa, 1988

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
for record inquires talk to Nirav
Unit 111, 1515 King Street East
Cambridge ON  N3H 3R6
Phone: (519) 219-8794
Electoral District: 03
Find more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

PO Box 33086
Franklin PO
Cambridge ON  N1R 8R0
Canada
County: Regional Municipality of Waterloo
Electoral District: 03

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 12 Jun 1990 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. PETER CONRAD WOZNIAK may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. WOZNIAK is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 15 Jun 1988 to 14 Jun 1989
Other - Comprehensive Internship

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1989 to 30 Jun 1990
Resident 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1988
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 28 Jun 1989