Wray, Roger William (CPSO#: 31392)

Current Status: Active Member as of 31 Mar 1980

CPSO Registration Class: Restricted as of 17 May 2017

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:McGill University, 1978

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Barrhaven Mall
900 Greenbank Road
Nepean ON  K2J 1S8
Phone: (613) 825-1843
Electoral District: 07
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Roger Wray Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Dec 14 2012

Shareholders:
Dr. R. Wray ( CPSO# 31392 )

Business Address:
Barrhaven Mall
Suite 208
900 Greenbank Road
Nepean ON  K2J 1S8
Phone Number: (613) 825-1843

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 31 Mar 1980
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate Effective: 17 May 2017
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by member Effective: 17 May 2017

Practice Restrictions

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status  
member Effective: 17 May 2017 Active View Details [+]
            As from May 17, 2017, the following is imposed as a term, condition and
            limitation on the certificate of registration held by Dr. Roger William Wray,
            in accordance with an undertaking and consent given by Dr. Wray to the College
            of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario:

                               UNDERTAKING, ACKNOWLEDGEMENT AND CONSENT
                                            ("Undertaking")

                                                  of

                                        DR. ROGER WILLIAM WRAY
                                             ("Dr. Wray")

                                                  to 

                             COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO
                                            (the "College")



            A.    PREAMBLE

            (1)   In this Undertaking:

                  "Code" means the Health Professions Procedural Code, which is Schedule 2
                  to the Regulated Health Professions Act, 1991, S.O. 1991, c. 18, as
                  amended; 
                  
                  "Discipline Committee" means the Discipline Committee of the College;
                  
                  "IEP" means Individualized Education Plan;
                  
                   "OHIP" means the Ontario Health Insurance Plan; 
                  
                  "Public Register" means the College's register that is available to the
                  public;
                  
                  "QAC" means the Quality Assurance Committee of the College.
                  
            (2)   I, Dr. Wray, certificate of registration number 31392, am a member of the
                  College.  

            (3)   I, Dr. Wray, acknowledge that concerns have been identified with respect
                  to my knowledge, skill and judgment. I am aware of the College's concern
                  about protecting the public.

            B.    UNDERTAKING

            (4)   I, Dr. Wray, undertake to abide by the provisions of this Undertaking,
                  effective upon the date this Undertaking is approved by the QAC
                  ("Effective Date").


            (5)   Clinical Supervision

                  (a)   I, Dr. Wray, undertake to practise under the guidance of a clinical
                        supervisor(s) acceptable to the College (the "Clinical
                        Supervisor(s)"), for six (6) months ("Clinical Supervision"). 
                  
                  (b)   I, Dr. Wray, acknowledge that I have reviewed the Clinical
                        Supervisor's undertaking attached hereto as Appendix "A", and
                        understand what is required of the Clinical Supervisor(s). The
                        Clinical Supervisor(s) will, at minimum:
                  
                        (i)   Facilitate the education program set out in the IEP attached
                              as Appendix "B";
                  
                        (ii)  Review materials and have an initial meeting to discuss
                              practice improvement recommendations;
                  
                        (iii) Meet with me at my Practice Location, or another location
                              approved by the College, once every other week ("First Phase
                              of Clinical Supervision");
                  
                        (iv)  During the First Phase of Clinical Supervision, review at
                              least ten (10) of my patient charts at every meeting;
                  
                        (v)   After a minimum of three (3) months in the First Phase of
                              Clinical Supervision, meet with me at my Practice Location,
                              or another location approved by the College, once every month
                              ("Second Phase of Clinical Supervision");
                  
                        (vi)  During the Second Phase of Clinical Supervision, review at
                              least twenty (20) of my patient charts at every meeting;
                  
                        (vii) Discuss management of patients on long-term narcotics,
                              monitoring diabetes and medical record keeping practices;
                  
                        (viii)Discuss any concerns arising from the chart reviews;
                  
                        (ix)  Make recommendations to me for practice improvements and
                              ongoing professional development and inquire into my
                              compliance with the recommendations;
                  
                        (x)   Perform any other duties, such as reviewing other documents
                              or conducting interviews with staff or colleagues, that the
                              Clinical Supervisor(s) deem necessary to my Clinical
                              Supervision; and
                  
                        (xi)  Submit written reports to the College at least once every
                              month, or more frequently if the Clinical Supervisor(s) has
                              concerns about my standard of practice.
                  
                  (c)   I, Dr. Wray, acknowledge that the charts reviewed shall be selected
                        by the Clinical Supervisor(s) based on the educational needs
                        identified in the IEP set out at Appendix "B" to my Undertaking, as
                        well as the areas of concern identified in the report(s) of the
                        assessor dated June 3, 2016, and concerns that may arise during the
                        period of Clinical Supervision. The Clinical Supervisor will ensure
                        that there is a good distribution of charts reflecting care to
                        patients on long term narcotics, as well as diabetics,
                        immunizations, patients requiring prostate cancer screening and
                        general assessments.
                  
                  (d)   I, Dr. Wray, undertake to cooperate fully with the Clinical
                        Supervision of my practice described in section (5) of this
                        Undertaking and Appendix "A" attached, and undertake to abide by
                        the recommendations of my Clinical Supervisor(s), including but not
                        limited to recommended practice improvements and ongoing
                        professional development. 
                  
                  (e)   I, Dr. Wray, acknowledge that in making its determination that I
                        may return to unsupervised practice, the College may require that I
                        sign a further undertaking imposing terms, conditions and
                        limitations on my certificate of registration or requiring ongoing
                        reassessments, clinical supervision and/or monitoring. 
                  
                  (f)   I, Dr. Wray, undertake to ensure that Appendix "A" to this
                        Undertaking is signed and delivered to the College within thirty
                        (30) days of the Effective Date.
                  
                  (g)   I, Dr. Wray, undertake that if a person who has given an
                        undertaking in Appendix "A" to this Undertaking is unable or
                        unwilling to continue to fulfill its provisions, I shall, within
                        twenty (20) days of receiving notice of same, obtain an executed
                        undertaking in the same form from a similarly qualified person who
                        is acceptable to the College and ensure that it is delivered to the
                        College within that time.
                  
                  (h)   I, Dr. Wray, undertake that if I am unable to obtain a Clinical
                        Supervisor as set out in sections (5)(f) and (g) above, including
                        returning a signed Appendix "A" within twenty (20) days, I will
                        cease practising medicine until such time as I have obtained a
                        Clinical Supervisor acceptable to the College.  
                  
                  (i)   I, Dr. Wray, acknowledge that if I am required to cease practise as
                        a result of section (5)(h) above this will constitute a term,
                        condition or limitation on my certificate of registration and said
                        term, condition or limitation will be included on the public
                        register.
                  
            (6)   Professional Education

                  (a)   I, Dr. Wray, undertake to participate in and successfully complete
                        the following professional education (the "Professional
                        Education"):
                        (i)   programs satisfactory to the College in: 
                  
                              1.    medical record keeping; and
                  
                              2.    opioid prescribing; 
                  
                        (ii)  written summaries of each of the following:
                  
                              1.    Canadian Guidelines for Safe and Effective Use of
                                    Opioids for Chronic Non-Cancer Pain;
                  
                              2.    Ontario Immunization Schedule (Adult only);
                  
                              3.    Canadian Journal of Diabetes: Chronic Kidney Disease in
                                    Diabetes;
                  
                              4.    Canadian Task Force on Preventative Health Care -
                                    Prostate Cancer;
                  
                              5.    College Policy #4-12: Medical Records;
                  
                        (iii) all aspects of the detailed IEP, attached hereto as Appendix
                              "B"; and
                  
                        (iv)  any additional professional education recommended by my
                              Clinical Supervisor(s).
                  
                  (b)   I, Dr. Wray, undertake to provide proof to the College of my
                        successful completion of the Professional Education, including
                        proof of registration and attendance and participant assessment
                        reports, within one (1) month of completing it. I acknowledge that
                        the College will determine, in its sole discretion, whether I have
                        successfully completed the Professional Education.
                  
                  (c)   I, Dr. Wray, acknowledge that a report or reports may be provided
                        to the College regarding my progress and compliance with the
                        Professional Education.
                  
                  (d)   I, Dr. Wray, undertake to complete this requirement at the first
                        possible opportunity.
                  
            (7)   Monitoring

                  (a)   I, Dr. Wray, undertake to inform the College of each and every
                        location that I practise or have privileges, including, but not
                        limited to, hospital(s), clinic(s) and office(s), in any
                        jurisdiction (collectively my "Practice Location(s)"), within five
                        (5) days of executing this Undertaking.  Going forward, I further
                        undertake to inform the College of any and all new Practice
                        Locations within five (5) days of commencing practice at that
                        location.
                  
                  (b)   I, Dr. Wray, undertake that I will submit to, and not interfere
                        with, unannounced inspections of my Practice Location(s) and
                        patient records by a College representative for the purposes of
                        monitoring my compliance with the provisions of this Undertaking.
                  
            C.    ACKNOWLEDGEMENT 

            (8)   I, Dr. Wray, acknowledge that all appendices attached to or referred to
                  in this Undertaking form part of this Undertaking.

            (9)   I, Dr. Wray, acknowledge and undertake that I shall be solely responsible
                  for payment of all fees, costs, charges, expenses, etc. arising from the
                  implementation of any of the provisions of this Undertaking.

            (10)  I, Dr. Wray, acknowledge that I have read and understand the provisions
                  of this Undertaking and that I have obtained independent legal counsel in
                  reviewing and executing this Undertaking, or have waived my right to do
                  so.

            (11)  I, Dr. Wray, acknowledge that the College will provide this Undertaking
                  to any Chief of Staff, or a colleague with similar responsibilities, at
                  any Practice Location ("Chief(s) of Staff").

            (12)  I, Dr. Wray, acknowledge that a breach by me of any provision of this
                  Undertaking may constitute an act of professional misconduct and/or
                  incompetence, and may result in any one or more of the following:
                  consideration by the QAC, an investigation by the College, or further
                  action by the College, including a referral of specified allegations to
                  the Discipline Committee.

            (13)  I, Dr. Wray, acknowledge that this Undertaking constitutes terms,
                  conditions, and limitations on my certificate of registration for the
                  purposes of section 23 of the Code. 

            (14)  Public Register

                  (a)   I, Dr. Wray, acknowledge that, during the time period that this
                        Undertaking remains in effect, this Undertaking shall be posted on
                        the Public Register.
                  
                  (b)   I, Dr. Wray, acknowledge that, in addition to this Undertaking
                        being posted in accordance with section (15)(a) above, the
                        following summary shall be posted on the Public Register during the
                        time period that this Undertaking remains in effect:
                  
                              Concerns have been identified with respect to Dr. Wray's
                              knowledge, skill and judgment. As a result:
                  
                              *     Dr. Wray will practise under the guidance of a Clinical
                                    Supervisor acceptable to the College for 6 months. 
                              *     Dr. Wray will engage in professional education in:
                                    -     opioid prescribing 
                                    -     medical recordkeeping
                              *     Dr. Wray will complete written summaries of: 
                                    -     Canadian Guidelines for Safe and Effective Use of
                                          Opioids for Chronic Non-Cancer Pain
                                    -     Ontario Immunization Schedule (Adult only)
                                    -     Canadian Journal of Diabetes: Chronic Kidney
                                          Disease in Diabetes
                                    -     Canadian Task Force on Preventative Health Care -
                                          Prostate Cancer
                                    -     College Policy #4-12: Medical Records
                  
            D.    CONSENT

            (15)  I, Dr. Wray, give my irrevocable consent to the College to make
                  appropriate enquiries of OHIP and/or any person who or institution that
                  may have relevant information, in order for the College to monitor my
                  compliance with the provisions of this Undertaking.

            (16)  I, Dr. Wray, acknowledge that I have executed the OHIP consent form,
                  attached hereto as Appendix "C".

            (17)  I, Dr. Wray, give my irrevocable consent to the College to provide the
                  following information to any person who facilitates my completion of the
                  Professional Education and to all Clinical Supervisors:

                  (a)   any information the College has that led to the circumstances of my
                        entering into this Undertaking;
                  
                  (b)   any information arising from any investigation into, or assessment
                        of, my practice; and 
                  
                  (c)   any information arising from the monitoring of my compliance with
                        this Undertaking.
                  
            (18)  I, Dr. Wray, give my irrevocable consent to the College to provide all
                  Chief(s) of Staff with any information arising from the monitoring of my
                  compliance with this Undertaking.

            (19)  I, Dr. Wray, give my irrevocable consent to all Clinical Supervisors,
                  Chiefs of Staff, and any persons who facilitate my completion of the
                  Professional Education, to disclose to the College, and to one another,
                  any information:

                  (a)   relevant to this Undertaking;
                  
                  (b)   relevant to the provisions of the Clinical Supervisor's undertaking
                        set out at Appendix "A";
                  
                  (c)   relevant for the purposes of monitoring my compliance with this
                        Undertaking; and  
                  
                  (d)   which comes to their attention in the course of providing the
                        Professional Education and which they reasonably believe indicates
                        a potential risk of harm to my patients.
                  

Concerns

Source: Member
Active Date: May 17, 2017
Expiry Date:
Summary:
Summary of the Undertaking given by Dr. Roger William Wray to the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario, effective May 17, 2017:
Concerns have been identified with respect to Dr. Wray’s knowledge, skill and judgment. As a result:
• Dr. Wray will practise under the guidance of a Clinical Supervisor acceptable to the College for 6 months.
• Dr. Wray will engage in professional education in:
- opioid prescribing
- medical recordkeeping
• Dr. Wray will complete written summaries of:
-Canadian Guidelines for Safe and Effective Use of Opioids for Chronic Non-Cancer Pain
-Ontario Immunization Schedule (Adult only)
-Canadian Journal of Diabetes: Chronic Kidney Disease in Diabetes
-Canadian Task Force on Preventative Health Care – Prostate Cancer
-College Policy #4-12: Medical Records