Wu, Raymond Hon Chuen (CPSO#: 50491)

Current Status: Suspended as of 04 May 2018

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 01 Jan 1987

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Cantonese, English

Education:National University of Ireland, 1981

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Raymond Wu Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jan 19 2010

Shareholders:
Dr. R. Wu ( CPSO# 50491 )

Business Address:
Unionville Family Medical Clinic
1 - 8 Cox Boulevard
Markham ON  L3R 4G1
Phone Number: (905) 470-6840

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

Hong Kong S A R

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Markham Stouffville Hospital Markham

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 19 Jan 1983
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 1984
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 01 Jan 1987
Suspension of registration imposed: Discipline Committee Effective: 04 May 2018

Practice Restrictions

Registration Status: Suspended     Effective From: 04 May 2018


Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status
Discipline Committee Effective: 04 May 2018 Active

Previous Hearings

Committee: Discipline
Decision Date: 01 May 2018
Summary:

On May 1, 2018, the Discipline Committee found that Dr. Raymond Hon Chuen Wu committed 
an act of professional misconduct, in that he has failed to maintain the standard of practice of the 
profession, and in that he has engaged in conduct or an act or omission relevant to the practice of 
medicine that, having regard to all of the circumstances, would reasonably be regarded by 
members as unprofessional.  
 
Dr. Raymond Wu is a general physician who received his certificate of registration authorizing 
independent practice in 1987. At the relevant time, Dr. Raymond Wu was acting as a locum at a 
family medicine practice in Markham and also has his own family medicine practice in 
Markham.  
 
Dr. Raymond Wu’s locum in Dr. Howard Wu’s practice 
 
Dr. Raymond Wu acted as a locum in the practice of his nephew, Dr. Howard Wu, from June 
2013 to December 2013, where he practised two days a week, seeing 60-70 patients per day, 
while Dr. Howard Wu’s certificate of registration was suspended. In his capacity as a locum in 
Dr. Howard Wu’s practice, Dr. Raymond Wu supervised employees of Dr. Howard Wu who 
were international medical graduates (the “IMGs”). In accordance with the office procedures 
established by Dr. Howard Wu, the IMGs saw patients on their own and discussed their findings, 
assessments and management plans with Dr. Raymond Wu. Dr. Raymond Wu then signed 
prescriptions and any notes the patients required. 
 
Some patients seen by the IMGs and for whom Dr. Raymond Wu completed medical device 
claims and prescribed medical devices were referred by the physiotherapy clinic next door for 
assessment of their musculoskeletal complaints. 
 
College Investigation 
 
The College commenced investigation, after Sun Life Assurance Company of Canada (“Sun 
Life”) contacted the College, expressing concerns that Dr. Raymond Wu had been 
inappropriately completing medical device claims and prescribing medical devices for patients 
where there was no medical necessity. The College retained an expert to provide an opinion on 
Dr. Raymond Wu’s standard of practice.   
 
The expert reviewed the charts of six patients identified by Sun Life as having prescriptions 
signed by Dr. Raymond Wu for whom he prescribed medical devices while he was acting as a 
locum in Dr. Howard Wu’s office. The expert opined that Dr. Raymond Wu’s documentation fell 
below the standard of care expected of a family physician in the six charts reviewed, including a 
lack of detailed history of the patients’ presenting complaints, a lack of relevant past medical 
history, a lack of a detailed and clinical exam relevant to the patients’ presenting complaints and 
a lack of assessments and diagnoses. The expert pointed out the following concerns regarding Dr. 
Raymond Wu’s documentation and patient care:  
 
-  The history of the presenting complaint is similar in all six charts reviewed: “pain in the low 
   back and neck (off and on chronic)”. No further details specific to each patient is 
   documented. 
-  The clinical exam findings are similar on all six charts reviewed: “paravertebrae tenderness 
   reduce ROM, Neuro Neg” and in some patents a comment that a particular joint “was tender 
   to palpation”. 
-  No exam findings documented of other joints that the patients were complaining of as being 
   painful. 
-  No investigations were ordered to aid in the diagnoses of the patient complaint (x-ray, 
   ultrasound, MRI or EMG). 
-  Lack of documented assessment or diagnoses. 
-  Recommendations for treatment are similar: “RICE Posture Better Support Shoes 
   Strengthening, PT and meds as needed”. 
-  For a patient that Dr. Raymond Wu has counselled there are four phrases that he uses. There 
   is no information documented that is specific to the patient who was seen. 
-  Dr. Raymond Wu documents “and meds as needed”. There is no information regarding the 
   name and dosage of the medications or the duration of the treatment. 
-  The documentation for follow-up visits lacks information regarding the patients response to 
   treatments recommended. 
-  No documentation to support the use of support stockings, TENS machine, back brace, knee 
   braces, ankle braces, elbow braces and wrist braces. 
-  Concern regarding the use of multiple braces per patient. 
-  Inappropriate use of braces for pain control and that the duration of brace use is for one year. 
 
The expert further opined that bracing can be used as an adjunct to other treatment modalities for 
patients presenting with musculoskeletal complaints. However, the expert noted that for the six 
patients, whose charts were reviewed, there was insufficient documentation of history, clinical 
examination and investigations to support their use. Also, the expert noted that, it is not the 
standard of clinical practice to use multiple bracing at one time and for the duration of one year 
and that these patients did not receive follow-up care to assess if the bracing was of clinical 
benefit in reducing their pain. The expert further opined that during the six months Dr. Raymond 
Wu was a locum of Dr. Howard Wu, he showed a lack of skill and knowledge with respect to his 
documentation of patient encounters. According to the expert, Dr. Raymond Wu lacked 
judgement, in that he either saw patients or supervised the International Medical Graduates 
seeing patients sent from the physiotherapy clinic next door for the purpose of receiving 
prescriptions for bracing, support stockings and TENS machines. 
 
The expert also reviewed five further patient charts received from Dr. Raymond Wu’s own 
family practice clinic and noted no concerns with regard to these five charts and patient care. The 
expert opined that Dr. Raymond Wu met the standard of care expected of a family physician in a 
busy urban setting. 
 
Disposition 
 
On May 1, 2018, the Committee ordered and directed that: 
 
-  the Registrar suspend Dr. Wu’s certificate of registration for a period of one (1) month, 
   commencing May 4, 2018 at 11:59 p.m. 
-  Dr. Wu attend before the panel to be reprimanded. 
-  Dr. Wu pay costs to the College in the amount of $6,000.00 within 30 days of the date this 
   Order becomes final.

Hearing Date(s): May 1, 2018