Baird, Wycliffe Hobart (CPSO#: 24565)

Current Status: Suspended as of 01 Dec 2017

CPSO Registration Class: Restricted as of 08 Jul 2016

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:Dalhousie University, 1972

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Hospital Privileges

No Privileges reported.

Hospital Notices

Source:  Hospital
Active Date:  July 9, 2014
Expiry Date:  
Summary:  
On July 15, 2014, Trillium Health Partners notified the College that Dr. Wycliffe H. Baird's privileges were suspended, effective July 9, 2014. On September 11, 2014, Trillium Health Partners notified the College of the termination of the suspension consequent to Dr. Baird's retirement and relinquishment of privileges, effective September 10, 2014.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 13 Jul 1972
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate Effective: 08 Jul 2016
Terms and conditions amended by Discipline Committee Effective: 01 Nov 2017
Suspension of registration imposed: Discipline Committee Effective: 01 Dec 2017

Practice Restrictions

Registration Status: Suspended     Effective From: 01 Dec 2017


Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status
Discipline Committee Effective: 01 Dec 2017 Active

Previous Hearings

Committee: Discipline
Decision Date: 16 Oct 2017
Summary:

On October 16, 2017, the Discipline Committee found that Dr. Wycliffe Hobart Baird committed 
an act of professional misconduct, in that he has engaged in sexual abuse of a patient and in that 
he has engaged in a conduct or an act or omission relevant to the practice of medicine that, 
having regard to all the circumstances, would reasonably be regarded by members as disgraceful, 
dishonourable or unprofessional. 
 
Dr. Baird is a general practitioner who received his certificate of registration authorizing 
independent practice in Ontario in 1972. At. the relevant time, Dr. Baird practised Emergency 
Medicine at Trillium Health Partners (“the Hospital”), in Mississauga, Ontario.  
 
Patient A: Dr. Baird’s Comments of a Sexual Nature 
 
In May 2011, Patient A attended the Hospital’s emergency department in respect of a knee 
injury, sustained after falling off of her motorcycle. Mr. X, who was with Patient A at the time of 
her injury, attended at the Hospital with her. Patient A was provided with a hospital gown and 
removed her pants, so that her injury could be assessed by Dr. Baird.  
 
When Patient A asked Dr. Baird when she would be able to stand on the leg, Dr. Baird 
responded that she could stand on the leg at whatever point she was able to handle the pain. 
Patient A then asked Dr. Baird when she would be able to ride her motorcycle. Dr. Baird looked 
at Mr. X and stated words to the effect of: “he looks like a motorcycle, you could ride him.”  
 
Patient A was shocked and offended by this comment, which she perceived as sexual 
harassment. She promptly complained to the Hospital.  
 
When Dr. Baird was advised of the complaint, he expressed regret for his actions and remorse 
that the patient had been emotionally injured by the encounter. Dr. Baird agreed to write a letter 
of apology to the patient, including an assurance to the patient that as a result of this interaction 
being brought forward, he would change his behaviour.  
 
The letter of apology was not sent to Patient A. Instead, the Hospital attempted to arrange a 
meeting between Patient A and Dr. Baird.  However, Patient A rejected the invitation to meet 
with Dr. Baird.  
 
Nurse A: Dr. Baird’s Inappropriate Comments 
 
During an evening shift on April 29, 2012, Dr. Baird was the attending Emergency Room doctor. 
Nurse A was standing at the nursing station together with her co-workers when Dr. Baird was 
speaking to a patient and providing indirect instructions to the nursing staff. 
 
When the patient had left, Dr. Baird asked the nursing staff whether the instructions were 
understood. Nurse A jokingly stated that she did not understand. Dr.  Baird turned around in his 
chair to face Nurse A, patted his knees and said: “Nurse A come and sit on my lap so that I can 
spank you.” This comment was made in front of the nursing staff and two patients. Nurse A and 
her nursing colleagues then left the area.  
 
Nurse A was upset and offended as a result of Dr. Baird’s comments. At the end of the shift, 
Nurse A informed Dr. Baird that she felt uncomfortable, embarrassed and insulted by his 
comments. Dr. Baird apologized and stated that it should be taken as a joke. Nurse A filed a 
formal complaint against Dr. Baird.   
 
As a result of the complaint, Dr. Baird agreed to provide a formal letter of apology and to seek 
professional coaching with respect to eliminating inappropriate comments in the workplace, 
demonstrating professional conduct and developing a sense of empathy in order to understand 
how his comments can impact others.  
 
Dr. Baird successfully completed the professional coaching. 
 
Disposition 
 
On November 1, 2017, the Discipline Committee ordered and directed that: 
 
-   The Registrar suspend Dr. Baird’s certificate of registration for a period of two months, to 
    commence thirty (30) days from the date of this Order. 
-   The Registrar impose the following term, condition and limitation on Dr. Baird’s 
    certificate of registration: 
     -  Dr. Baird successfully complete individualized (one-on-one) instruction in medical 
        ethics, with an instructor approved by the College, at his own expense and provide 
        proof of completion to the College prior to his resumption of practice. 
-   Dr. Baird reimburse the College for funding provided to Patient A under the program 
    required under section 85.7 of the Code, by posting an irrevocable letter of credit or other 
    security acceptable to the College, within thirty days of the date of this Order, in the 
    amount of $16,060.00. 
-   Dr. Baird appear before the panel to be reprimanded within sixty (60) days of this Order. 
-   Dr. Baird pay costs to the College in the amount of $5,500.00 within thirty (30) days of 
    this Order.

Decision: Download Full Decision (PDF)
Hearing Date(s): October 16, 2017


Committee: Discipline
Decision Date: 16 May 1990
Summary:

 In May 1990, the Discipline Committee found Dr. Baird guilty of professional misconduct, as defined 
 in Ontario Regulation 448/80, as amended, in that he charged a fee that was excessive in relation 
 to the services performed, contrary to s. 27(9); in that he failed to provide within a reasonable 
 time and without cause a report or certificate requested by a patient or his authorized agent in 
 respect of an examination or treatment performed by him, contrary to s. 27(27); and in that he 
 engaged in conduct or an act relevant to the practice of medicine that, having regard to all the 
 circumstances, would reasonably be regarded by members as disgraceful, dishonourable or 
 unprofessional, contrary to s. 27(32).  Consequently, the Committee ordered that Dr. Baird's 
 licence to practice medicine be suspended for a period of three months.

Appeal: Appeal Dismissed
Appeal Decision Date: 18 Jun 1991
Hearing Date(s): 08 Jan 1990

Concerns

Source: Member
Active Date: July 8, 2016
Expiry Date:
Summary:
Summary of the Undertaking given by Dr. Wycliffe Hobart Baird to the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario, effective July 8, 2016:

• Dr. Baird does not practice Emergency Medicine.
Download Full Document (PDF)