Wycoco, Danilo Andres (CPSO#: 42465)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1975

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 19 Jul 1983

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Filipino, Tagalog

Education:University of Santo Tomas, 1972

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Grand River Hospital - K W H C
835 King Street West
Kitchener ON  N2G 1G3
Phone: (519) 749-4300 Ext. 3822
Electoral District: 03
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Danilo Wycoco Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jul 06 2004

Shareholders:
Dr. D. Wycoco ( CPSO# 42465 )

Business Address:
Grand River Hospital
Medical Imaging Department
835 King Street West
Kitchener ON  N2G 1G3
Phone Number: (519) 749-4300

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Diagnostic Radiology Effective: 25 Nov 1981 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. DANILO ANDRES WYCOCO may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. WYCOCO is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1975
Transfer of class of registration to: Hospital Practice Certificate Effective: 03 Mar 1982
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 19 Jul 1983