Wyllie, Blair Frederick (CPSO#: 76606)

Current Status: Active Member as of 30 Jun 2005

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2005

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 2001

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
LHSC Victoria Hospital
800 Commissioners Road East
London ON  N6A 5W9
Phone: (519) 685-8132
Fax: (519) 685-8357
Electoral District: 02
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Blair Wyllie Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Aug 02 2011

Shareholders:
Dr. B. Wyllie ( CPSO# 76606 )

Business Address:
London Health Sciences Centre
PO Box 5010
800 Commissioners Road East
London ON  N6A 5W9
Phone Number: (519) 685-8132

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
London Health Sciences Centre Victoria Hospital London
London Health Sciences Centre,University Site London
St Joseph's Health Care-St Joseph's Site,London London

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 2005 RCPSC Specialist
Nephrology Effective: 13 Sep 2006 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. BLAIR FREDERICK WYLLIE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. WYLLIE is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 5 - Nephrology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2001
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2004
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2005