Yang, Heather Christine (CPSO#: 70431)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1996

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2000

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Memorial University of Newfoundland, 1996

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
St Josephs Health Centre
30 The Queensway
Toronto ON  M6R 1B5
Phone: (416) 530-6625
Fax: (416) 530-6294
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: H.C. Yang Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Feb 13 2006

Shareholders:
Dr. H. Yang ( CPSO# 70431 )

Business Address:
30 The Queensway
Toronto ON  M6R 1B5
Phone Number: (416) 530-6000

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
St Joseph's Health Centre,Toronto Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Pediatrics Effective: 30 Jun 2000 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. HEATHER CHRISTINE YANG may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. YANG is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
PostGrad Yr 1 - Pediatrics

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
PostGrad Yr 2 - Pediatrics

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
PostGrad Yr 3 - Pediatrics

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1999 to 30 Jun 2000
PostGrad Yr 4 - Pediatrics

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1996
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2000