Yanni, Ahlam Helal Riskalla (CPSO#: 63507)

Current Status: Active Member as of 17 Jun 1991

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 03 Jul 1992

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: Arabic, English

Education:University of Cairo, 1980

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Family Practice And Obstetrics
Suite 202
1920 Ellesmere Road
Toronto ON  M1H 2V6
Phone: (416) 449-6132
Fax: (416) 449-6132
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr.Ahlam Yanni Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jul 13 2006

Shareholders:
Dr. A. Yanni ( CPSO# 63507 )

Business Address:
Suite 202
1920 Ellesmere Road
Toronto ON  M1H 2V6
Phone Number: (416) 449-6132

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. AHLAM HELAL RISKALLA YANNI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. YANNI is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1992 to 30 Jun 1993
Resident 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 17 Jun 1991
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 03 Jul 1992