Yaphe, Joel (CPSO#: 31898)

Current Status: Active Member as of 02 Jul 1985

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 02 Jul 1985

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1978

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
University Health Network
Department of Emergency Medicine
190 Elizabeth Street
Toronto ON  M5G 2C4
Phone: (416) 340-3946
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Albert Yaphe Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Oct 28 2014

Shareholders:
Dr. J. Yaphe ( CPSO# 31898 )
Dr. L. Albert ( CPSO# 59644 )

Business Address:
190 Elizabeth Street
Toronto ON  M5G 2C4
Phone Number: (416) 340-3946

Business Address:
Toronto Western Hospital
Room 1E-424
399 Bathurst Street
Toronto ON  M5T 2S8
Phone Number: (416) 735-1135

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
University Health Network,Toronto General Hospital Site Toronto
University Health Network,Toronto Western Hospital Site Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Emergency Medicine Effective: 18 Nov 1987 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. JOEL YAPHE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. YAPHE is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 11 Aug 1980
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jul 1983
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 02 Jul 1985