Yates, Stephen Kenneth (CPSO#: 59447)

Current Status: Active Member as of 15 Jun 1988

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 19 Jul 1989

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 1988

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Maple Family Health Team
Unit D2
1036 Princess Street
Kingston ON  K7L 1H2
Phone: (613) 546-9721
Fax: (613) 546-2799
Electoral District: 06
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Stephen Yates Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Apr 28 2003

Shareholders:
Dr. S. Yates ( CPSO# 59447 )

Business Address:
D2 - 1036 Princess Street
Kingston ON  K7L 1H2
Phone Number: (613) 546-9721

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 12 Jun 1990 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. STEPHEN KENNETH YATES may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. YATES is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 15 Jun 1988 to 14 Jun 1989
Other - Comprehensive Internship

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1989 to 30 Jun 1990
Resident 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1988
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 19 Jul 1989