Yau, Pak Choong (CPSO#: 22098)

Current Status: Active Member as of 23 Jun 2006

CPSO Registration Class: Restricted as of 20 Feb 2015

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Cantonese, Chinese, English, Italian

Education:University of Manchester, 1964

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
1223-1225 St. Clair Avenue West
Toronto ON  M6E 1B5
Phone: (416) 654-8864
Fax: (416) 654-9446
Electoral District: 10
Find more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

1995A Weston Road
Toronto ON  M9N 2X1
Canada
Phone: (416) 242-2216
Fax: (416) 242-9751
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. P.C. Yau Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Nov 11 2011

Shareholders:
Dr. P. Yau ( CPSO# 22098 )

Business Address:
1223 - 1225 St. Clair Avenue West
Suite 303
Toronto ON  M6E 1B5
Phone Number: (416) 654-8864

Business Address:
1995A Weston Road
Toronto ON  M9N 1X2
Phone Number: (416) 242-2216

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Temporary Employment Practice Certificate Effective: 19 Apr 1968
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 04 Jul 1969
Suspension of registration imposed: Executive Committee Effective: 23 Nov 2005
Suspension of registration removed Effective: 23 Jun 2006
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate Effective: 05 Apr 2007
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate Effective: 05 Apr 2007
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 25 Jun 2008
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate Effective: 20 Feb 2015
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by member Effective: 20 Feb 2015

Practice Restrictions

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status  
member Effective: 20 Feb 2015 Active View Details [+]
            As from February 20, 2015, the following is imposed as a term, condition and
            limitation on the certificate of registration held by Dr. Patrick Choong Yau,
            in accordance with an undertaking and consent given by Dr. Yau to the College
            of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario:

                  Dr. Yau shall not sign any Special Dietary Allowance forms unless the
                  form has been reviewed and approved by a physician acceptable to the
                  College, prior to it being signed  by Dr. Yau. 

Previous Discipline Hearings

Committee: Discipline
Decision Date: 05 Apr 2007
Summary:

 1.	On April 5, 2007, the Discipline found that Dr. Yau has committed an act of professional 
 misconduct under paragraph 1(1)33 of Ontario Regulation 856/93 made pursuant to the Medicine Act, 
 1991, in that he engaged in disgraceful, dishonourable or unprofessional conduct by renewing 
 prescriptions for two patients while his certificate of registration was suspended.  The 
 Discipline Committee ordered and directed that: 

2.	Dr. Yau appear before the panel to be 
 reprimanded.

3.	The results of this proceeding to be included in the register.

4.	The Registrar 
 impose the following term, condition and limitation on Dr. Yau's certificate of 
 registration:

that Dr. Yau shall undergo and successfully complete to the satisfaction of the 
 College an assessment under the direction of the College within twelve (12) months from the date 
 of this Order.  The assessment will be at Dr. Yau's expense and shall include, an observation 
 component, consultation with his treating psychiatrist, and a chart review.  Dr. Yau shall comply 
 with any reasonable recommendations of the College that result from the assessment.

5.	Dr. Yau 
 shall within 30 days pay the College its costs of this proceeding in the amount of $2,500.00.

Decision: Download Full Decision (PDF)
Appeal: No Appeal
Hearing Date(s): Apr 05, 2007