Yau, Terrence Michael (CPSO#: 59842)

Current Status: Active Member as of 13 Jun 1988

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 29 Apr 1996

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McGill University, 1988

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Toronto General Hospital
4N 470
200 Elizabeth Street
Toronto ON  M5G 2C4
Phone: (416) 340-4074
Fax: (416) 340-4385
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Terrence Michael Yau Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jul 21 2006

Shareholders:
Dr. T. Yau ( CPSO# 59842 )

Business Address:
Toronto General Hospital
200 Elizabeth Street
Suite 4N 470
Toronto ON  M5G 2C4
Phone Number: (416) 340-4074

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
University Health Network,Toronto General Hospital Site Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
General Surgery Effective: 05 Nov 1995 RCPSC Specialist
Cardiac Surgery Effective: 04 Sep 1997 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. TERRENCE MICHAEL YAU may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. YAU is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 13 Jun 1988 to 12 Jun 1989
Other - General Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1989 to 30 Jun 1990
Resident 1 - General Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1990 to 30 Jun 1991
Resident 2 - General Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1991 to 30 Jun 1992
Resident 2 - General Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1992 to 30 Jun 1993
Resident 3 - General Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1993 to 30 Jun 1994
Resident 4 - General Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1994 to 30 Jun 1995
Resident 5 - General Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
Resident 6 - General Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 13 Jun 1988
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 29 Apr 1996