Yeates, Gillian Rose (CPSO#: 68825)

Current Status: Active Member as of 27 Jul 2000

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 27 Jul 2000

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Dalhousie University, 1995

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 2
460 Hume Street
Collingwood ON  L9Y 1W6
Phone: (705) 444-5533
Fax: (844) 237-0088
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Gillian Yeates Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Dec 24 2007

Shareholders:
Dr. G. Yeates ( CPSO# 68825 )

Business Address:
Suite 2
460 Hume Street
Collingwood ON  L9Y 1W6
Phone Number: (705) 444-5533

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Collingwood General and Marine Hospital Collingwood

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Obstetrics and Gynecology Effective: 30 Jun 2000 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. GILLIAN ROSE YEATES may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. YEATES is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
PostGrad Yr 1 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
PostGrad Yr 2 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
PostGrad Yr 3 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
PostGrad Yr 4 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1999 to 30 Jun 2000
PostGrad Yr 5 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1995
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2000
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 27 Jul 2000