Yee, Ernest (CPSO#: 65734)

Current Status: Active Member as of 02 Jul 1992

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 14 Jul 1993

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:University of Sherbrooke, 1992

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Room 350
265 Dundas Street East
Belleville ON  K8N 5A9
Phone: (613) 966-3301
Fax: (613) 966-3396
Electoral District: 06
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. E. Yee Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Dec 09 2005

Shareholders:
Dr. E. Yee ( CPSO# 65734 )

Business Address:
Belleville General Hospital
350 - 265 Dundas Street
Belleville ON  K8N 5A9
Phone Number: (613) 966-3301

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Quinte Healthcare,Belleville General Site Belleville

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 1996 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ERNEST YEE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. YEE is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

Queen's University, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
Resident 4 - Internal Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 02 Jul 1992
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 14 Jul 1993