Yee, Irvan (CPSO#: 55836)

Current Status: Active Member as of 15 Jun 1985

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 08 Apr 1988

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of British Columbia, 1985

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Department of Anesthesiology
Royal Victoria Regional Health
Centre
201 Georgian Drive
Barrie ON  L4M 6M2
Phone: (705) 728-9090 Ext. 46550
Fax: (705) 739-5613
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Irvan Yee Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jul 30 2009

Shareholders:
Dr. I. Yee ( CPSO# 55836 )

Business Address:
Department of Anesthesiology
Royal Victoria Hospital of Barrie
201 Georgian Drive
Barrie ON  L4M 6M2
Phone Number: (705) 728-9090

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Royal Victoria Regional Health Centre Barrie

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Anesthesiology Effective: 04 Jun 1990 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. IRVAN YEE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. YEE is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1989 to 30 Jun 1990
Resident 4 - Anesthesiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1985
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 08 Apr 1988