Yelle, Joseph Philibert Jean Denis (CPSO#: 56029)

Current Status: Active Member as of 26 Jun 1985

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 26 Jun 1985

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:University of Montreal, 1981

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Ottawa Hospital - Civic Campus
1053 Carling Avenue
CPC -1
Ottawa ON  K1Y 4E9
Phone: (613) 798-5555 Ext. 19605
Fax: (613) 761-4262
Electoral District: 07
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Jean-Denis Yelle Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jun 27 2006

Shareholders:
Dr. J. Yelle ( CPSO# 56029 )

Business Address:
Ottawa Hospital
Civic Campus
1053 Carling Avenue
Ottawa ON  K1Y 4E9
Phone Number: (613) 798-5555

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Ottawa Hospital,Civic Site Ottawa
Ottawa Hospital,Riverside Site Ottawa
Winchester District Memorial Hospital Winchester

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
General Surgery Effective: 14 Nov 1990 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. JOSEPH PHILIBERT JEAN DENIS YELLE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. YELLE is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1989 to 30 Jun 1990
Resident 4 - General Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 26 Jun 1985