Yeung, Clement Ka-Chun (CPSO#: 32020)

Current Status: Active Member as of 23 Jul 2012

CPSO Registration Class: Restricted as of 23 Jan 2012

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Cantonese, Chinese, English, Mandarin

Education:McGill University, 1979

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Unit 102
9249 Kennedy Road
Markham ON  L3R 6H8
Phone: (905) 470-7373
Fax: (905) 470-7374
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: C.K. Yeung Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  May 15 2014

Shareholders:
Dr. C. Yeung ( CPSO# 32020 )

Business Address:
Unit 102
9249 Kennedy Road
Markham ON  L3R 6H8
Phone Number: (905) 470-7373

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 16 Oct 1980
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership Expiry: 02 Aug 2002
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 16 Aug 2002
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate Effective: 23 Jan 2012
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate Effective: 23 Jan 2012
Suspension of registration imposed: Discipline Committee Effective: 23 Jan 2012
Suspension of registration removed Effective: 23 Jul 2012
Terms and conditions amended by member Effective: 09 Jan 2017

Practice Restrictions

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status  
member Effective: 09 Jan 2017 Active View Details [+]
            As from January 9, 2017, the following is imposed as a term, condition and
            limitation on the certificate of registration held by Dr. Clement Ka-Chun
            Yeung, in accordance with an undertaking and consent given by Dr. Yeung to the
            College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario:

                        UNDERTAKING, ACKNOWLEDGEMENT AND CONSENT 
                                          ("Undertaking")
                  
                                                of
                  
                                    DR. CLEMENT KA-CHUN YEUNG
                                          ("Dr. Yeung")
                  
                                                to 
                  
                        COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO
                                          (the "College")
                  
            A.    PREAMBLE

            (1)   In this Undertaking:

                  "Code" means the Health Professions Procedural Code, which is Schedule 2
                  to the Regulated Health Professions Act, 1991, S.O. 1991, c. 18, as
                  amended; 
                  
                  "ICR Committee" means the Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee of
                  the College;
                  
                  "NMS" means the Drug Program Services Branch, the Narcotics Monitoring
                  System implemented under the Narcotics Safety and Awareness Act, 2010;

                  "OHIP" means the Ontario Health Insurance Plan.
                  
            (2)   I, Dr. Yeung, certificate of registration number 32020, am a member of
                  the College.  The College has received information regarding my standard
                  of practice.

            (3)   I, Dr. Yeung, acknowledge that my practice was the subject of an
                  assessment by the College.

            B.    UNDERTAKING

            (4)   I, Dr. Yeung, acknowledge and agree that I am bound by this Undertaking
                  from the date on which I sign it.

            (5)   Clinical Supervision 

                  (a)   I, Dr. Yeung, undertake to practise under the guidance of a
                        clinical supervisor(s) appointed by the College (the "Clinical
                        Supervisor(s)"), for at least twelve (12) months ("Clinical
                        Supervision"). 
                  
                  (b)   I, Dr. Yeung, acknowledge that I have reviewed the Clinical
                        Supervisor(s)'s undertaking, attached hereto as Appendix "A", and
                        understand what is required of the Clinical Supervisor(s). The
                        Clinical Supervisor(s) will, at minimum: 
                  
                        (i)   Facilitate the education program set out in the
                              Individualized Education Plan ("IEP") attached as Appendix
                              "B";
                  
                        (ii)  Review at least fifteen (15) of my patient charts once every
                              month for a period of at least three (3) months;
                  
                        (iii) Meet with me once every month for a period of at least three
                              (3) months
                  
                        (iv)  Directly observe my practice for a minimum of one half day
                              every month, including observing at minimum 6-10 patient
                              encounters for a period of at least three (3) months;
                  
                        (v)   Discuss any concerns arising from the chart reviews and the
                              direct observation of patient encounters;
                  
                        (vi)  Make recommendations to me for practice improvements and
                              ongoing professional development and inquire into my
                              compliance with the recommendations; 
                  
                        (vii) If after three (3) months, the Clinical Supervisor is of the
                              opinion that I have made sufficient improvement in my medical
                              record-keeping and my care to practice under a lower level
                              supervision, and subject to approval from the College, for
                              the remaining nine (9) months of the supervision, the
                              Clinical Supervisor may: 
                  
                              i.    Review at least fifteen (15) of my charts once every
                                    quarter; and 
                              ii.   Meet with me at least once every quarter;
                  
                        (viii)Perform any other duties, such as reviewing other documents
                              or conducting interviews with staff or colleagues, that the
                              Clinical Supervisor(s) deem necessary to my Clinical
                              Supervision; and
                  
                        (ix)  Submit written reports to the College following every
                              meeting, or more frequently if the Clinical Supervisor(s) has
                              concerns about my standard of practice.
                  
                  (c)   I, Dr. Yeung, acknowledge that the charts reviewed shall be
                        selected by the Clinical Supervisor(s) based on the educational
                        needs identified in the IEP set out at Appendix "B" to my
                        Undertaking, as well as the areas of concern identified in the
                        report(s) of the assessor dated September 14, 2016, and concerns
                        that may arise during the period of Clinical Supervision.
                  
                  (d)   I, Dr. Yeung, undertake to cooperate fully with the Clinical
                        Supervision of my practice, conducted under the term of this
                        Undertaking and Appendix "A" attached, and to abide by the
                        recommendations of my Clinical Supervisor(s), including but not
                        limited to, any recommended practice improvements and ongoing
                        professional development.
                  
                  (e)   I, Dr. Yeung, acknowledge and agree that the College will appoint a
                        Clinical Supervisor who has executed the undertaking at Appendix
                        "A" within thirty (30) days of the date I execute this Undertaking.
                  
                  (f)   I, Dr. Yeung, acknowledge and agree that if a person who has given
                        an undertaking in Appendix "A" to this Undertaking is unable or
                        unwilling to continue to fulfill its provisions, the College will,
                        within twenty (20) days of receiving notice of same, obtain an
                        executed undertaking in the same form from a similarly qualified
                        person who is appointed by the College. 
                  
                  (g)   I, Dr. Yeung, agree that if, at any time, I terminate my
                        relationship with the Clinical Supervisor or refuse to practice
                        under the terms of Clinical Supervision as set out in section (5)
                        of this Undertaking, I will cease practising medicine until the
                        terms of the Clinical Supervision are varied and/or approved by the
                        College.  
                  
                  (h)   I, Dr. Yeung, agree that if I am required to cease practise as a
                        result of section (5)(g) above this will constitute a term,
                        condition or limitation on my certificate of registration and that
                        term, condition or limitation will be included on the public
                        register.
                  
            (6)   Professional Education  

                  (a)   I, Dr. Yeung, undertake to participate in and successfully complete
                        the following professional education:
                  
                        (i)   all aspects of the detailed IEP, attached hereto as Appendix
                              "B"; and
                  
                        (ii)  any additional professional education recommended by my
                              Clinical Supervisor(s).
                  
                  (b)   I, Dr. Yeung, undertake to provide proof to the College of my
                        successful completion of the professional education set out in
                        section (6)(a) within one (1) month of completing it.
                  
                  (c)   I, Dr. Yeung, acknowledge that a report or reports may be provided
                        to the College regarding my progress and compliance with the
                        professional education set out in section (6)(a).
                  
            (7)   Reassessment of Practice

                  (a)   I, Dr. Yeung, undertake that, approximately three (3) months after
                        the completion of the Clinical Supervision set out in section (5)
                        above and Appendix "A" attached, I will submit to a Reassessment of
                        my practice ("the Reassessment") by an assessor or assessors
                        selected by the College (the "Assessor(s)").  I acknowledge and
                        agree that the Reassessment may include a chart review, direct
                        observation of my care, interviews with colleagues and co-workers,
                        feedback from patients and any other tools deemed necessary by the
                        College.
                  
                  (b)   I, Dr. Yeung, undertake to co-operate fully with the Reassessment,
                        conducted under the term of this Undertaking and to abide by those
                        recommendations of the Assessor(s) that are approved by the ICR
                        Committee. 
                  
                  (c)   I, Dr. Yeung, understand and agree that if I am of the view that
                        any of the Assessor(s)'s recommendations are unreasonable, I will
                        have thirty (30) days following my receipt of the recommendations
                        within which to provide the College with my submissions in this
                        regard.  I further understand and agree that thereafter, the ICR
                        Committee will consider my submissions and make a determination
                        regarding whether or not the recommendations, or any of them, are
                        reasonable and if so, whether they, or any of them, constitute
                        limitations or restrictions on my practice, and that decision will
                        be provided to me.
                  
                  (d)   I, Dr. Yeung, undertake that, following the decision referenced in
                        section (7)(c) above, I will abide by those recommendations of the
                        Assessor(s) that the ICR Committee has determined are reasonable. 
                  
                  (e)   I, Dr. Yeung, hereby consent to any of the following being included
                        on the public register as terms, conditions or limitations on my
                        certificate of registration, for the purposes of section 23 of the
                        Code: 
                  
                        (i)   any recommendations of the Assessor(s) which are terms,
                              conditions or limitations on my practice;  
                  
                        (ii)  any recommendations of the Assessor(s) which the ICR
                              Committee has identified in its decision referenced in
                              section (7)(c) as terms, conditions or limitations on my
                              practice.
                  
            (8)   Monitoring 

                  (a)   I, Dr. Yeung, undertake to inform the College of each and every
                        location that I practise or have privileges, including, but not
                        limited to, hospital(s), clinic(s) and office(s), in any
                        jurisdiction (collectively my "Practice Location(s)"), within five
                        (5) days of executing this Undertaking.  Going forward, I further
                        undertake to inform the College of any and all new Practice
                        Locations within five (5) days of commencing practice at that
                        location.
                  
                  (b)   I, Dr. Yeung, undertake and agree that I will submit to, and not
                        interfere with, unannounced inspections of my Practice Location(s)
                        and patient records by a College representative for the purposes of
                        monitoring my compliance with the provisions of this Undertaking.
                  
                  (c)   I, Dr. Yeung, give my irrevocable consent to the College to make
                        appropriate enquiries of OHIP, NMS and/or any person who or
                        institution that may have relevant information, in order for the
                        College to monitor my compliance with the provisions of this
                        Undertaking. 
                  
                  (d)   I, Dr. Yeung, acknowledge that I have executed the OHIP and NMS
                        consent form(s), attached hereto as Appendix "C" and Appendix "D",
                        respectively. 
                  
            (9)   I, Dr. Yeung, undertake to comply with this Undertaking and acknowledge
                  that a breach by me of any provision of this Undertaking may constitute
                  an act of professional misconduct and/or incompetence, and may result in
                  a referral of specified allegations to the Discipline Committee of the
                  College.

            C.    ACKNOWLEDGEMENT

            (10)  I, Dr. Yeung, acknowledge that all appendices attached to or referred to
                  in this Undertaking form part of this Undertaking.

            (11)  I, Dr. Yeung, acknowledge that I shall be solely responsible for payment
                  of all fees, costs, charges, expenses, etc. arising from the
                  implementation of any of the provisions of this Undertaking. 

            (12)  I, Dr. Yeung, acknowledge and confirm that I have read and understand the
                  provisions of this Undertaking and that I have obtained independent legal
                  counsel in reviewing and executing this Undertaking, or have waived my
                  right to do so.

            (13)  I, Dr. Yeung, acknowledge that this entire Undertaking constitutes terms,
                  conditions, and limitations on my certificate of registration for the
                  purposes of section 23 of the Code. 

            (14)  Public Register

                  (a)   I, Dr. Yeung, acknowledge that, during the time period that this
                        Undertaking remains in effect, this Undertaking shall be posted on
                        the Public Register.
                  
                  (b)   I, Dr. Yeung, acknowledge that, in addition to this Undertaking
                        being posted in accordance with section (14)(a) above, the
                        following summary shall be posted on the Public Register during the
                        time period that this Undertaking remains in effect:
                  
                              Dr. Yeung was the subject of an assessment by the College. As
                              a result of the assessment:
                  
                              *     Dr. Yeung will practise under the guidance of a
                                    Clinical Supervisor for twelve (12) months; and
                  
                              *     Dr. Yeung's practice will be reassessed by an assessor
                                    within three (3) months of the end of the period of
                                    Clinical Supervision.
                  
            D.    CONSENT

            (15)  I, Dr. Yeung, give my irrevocable consent to the College to provide the
                  following information to any person who requires this information for the
                  purposes of facilitating my completion of the professional education set
                  out in section (6) above and to all Clinical Supervisors, and/or
                  Assessors:

                  (a)   any information the College has that led to the circumstances of my
                        entering into this Undertaking;
                  
                  (b)   any information arising from any investigation into, or assessment
                        of, my practice; and 
                  
                  (c)   any information arising from the monitoring of my compliance with
                        this Undertaking.
                  
            (16)  I, Dr. Yeung, give my irrevocable consent to the College to provide this
                  Undertaking to any Chief of Staff, or a colleague with similar
                  responsibilities, at any Practice Location ("Chief(s) of Staff"), and to
                  provide said Chief(s) of Staff with any information the College has that
                  led to the circumstances of my entering into this Undertaking and/or any
                  information arising from the monitoring of my compliance with this
                  Undertaking.

            (17)  I, Dr. Yeung, give my irrevocable consent to any person who facilitates
                  my completion of the professional education set out in section (6) above,
                  and to all Clinical Supervisors, Chiefs of Staff and Assessors, to
                  disclose to the College, and to one another, any information:

                  (a)   relevant to this Undertaking;
                  
                  (b)   relevant to the provisions of the Clinical Supervisor's undertaking
                        set out at Appendix "A";
                  
                  (c)   relevant to the Reassessment;
                  
                  (d)   relevant for the purposes of monitoring my compliance with this
                        Undertaking; and/or  
                  
                  (e)   which comes to his or her attention in the course of providing the
                        professional education set out in section (6) above and which he or
                        she reasonably believes indicates a potential risk of harm to my
                        patients.
                  
                  
            As from 11:59 p.m., January 23, 2012, by order of the Discipline Committee of
            the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario, the following terms,
            conditions and limitations are imposed on the certificate of registration held
            by Dr. Clement Ka-Chun Yeung:

                  (i)   that Dr. Yeung shall successfully complete the College's
                        Physician's Prescribing Skills course and shall successfully
                        complete an educational program in Ethics, both no later than one
                        (1) year from the date he commences practice in Ontario;
                  
                  (ii)  that Dr. Yeung shall keep a log of all Narcotics Drugs and Narcotic
                        Preparations prescribed for a period of one (1) year ("Narcotics
                        Log") from the date he commences practice in Ontario;
                  
                  (iii) that Dr. Yeung shall practice under a Clinical Supervisor
                        acceptable to the College for a period of one (1) year from the
                        date he commences practice in Ontario; such supervision shall take
                        place in a setting(s) which is acceptable to the College, and shall
                        consist of, at minimum, monthly reviews of patient charts and of
                        the Narcotics Log for the first three (3) months; and, thereafter,
                        at the discretion of the Clinical Supervisor, quarterly reviews
                        with quarterly reporting to the College throughout the supervision
                        period; and
                  
                  (iv)  that Dr. Yeung will undergo an assessment of his practice,
                        including his narcotics prescribing, approximately one (1) year
                        after the completion of the term of clinical supervision set out in
                        paragraph 3(iii).

Previous Discipline Hearings

Committee: Discipline
Decision Date: 23 Jan 2012
Summary:

On January 23, 2012, the Discipline Committee found that Dr. Clement Ka-Chun Yeung 
committed an act of professional misconduct, in that he has been found guilty of an offence that 
is relevant to his suitability to practice, and in that he engaged in conduct or an act or omission 
relevant to the practice of medicine that, having regard to all the circumstances, would 
reasonably be regarded by members as disgraceful, dishonourable or unprofessional. 
 
In 2007, Dr. Yeung disclosed to the College that he had been convicted in the State of Hawaii of 
charges relating to the dispensing of controlled substances to an undercover agent posing as a 
patient.  
 
On August 30, 2007, Dr. Yeung plead guilty to knowingly and intentionally distributing and 
dispensing outside the course of professional medical practice and not for a legitimate medical 
purpose approximately 1,400 milligrams of Oxycodone on June 14, 2002 and 800 milligrams of 
Oxycodone on June 21, 2002, in the District of Hawaii.  
 
On both occasions, Dr. Yeung met with an undercover DEA agent, who was known to Dr. Yeung 
as his patient, Mr. X. Based on his assessment over the course of 20 medical visits over a 
ten-month period, Dr. Yeung treated Mr. X for chronic back pain with prescription narcotic 
medication. During the course of treatment, Dr. Yeung took steps to decrease the risks associated 
with prescribing narcotic medication. On the two occasions in June 2002, Dr. Yeung met Mr. X 
in a parking lot and prescribed Oxycodone. Mr. X paid Dr. Yeung in cash, since he did not have 
Health Insurance. Dr. Yeung did not profit beyond receiving money for medical services 
rendered to Mr. X. 
 
Dr. Yeung provided written prescriptions to Mr. X for dosages and quantities that are within a 
reasonable range for a patient suffering with chronic back pain.  
 
Dr. Yeung was found guilty of the two counts noted above, and the sentence imposed by the 
court in Hawaii included that Dr. Yeung: be imprisoned for one year and one day; pay a 
$10,000.00 fine within 14 days; pay a $200.00 assessment fee; submit to removal proceedings, 
including deportation or exclusion, as required by the Department of Homeland Security; and 
surrender his Drug Enforcement Administration controlled substance registration. 
 
Dr. Yeung was incarcerated in Hawaii from January 11, 2008 to November 24, 2008 and was 
immediately deported from the United States at the conclusion of his incarceration. Dr. Yeung 
returned to Ontario in December 2008 where he resided until April 2009, at which time he 
moved to Hong Kong. Dr. Yeung held an unrestricted certificate of registration in Ontario during 
that period, but elected not to practice medicine in Ontario until the issues surrounding his 
criminal conviction in Hawaii could be addressed by the College.  
 
The Discipline Committee ordered and directed that: 
 
1.    Dr. Yeung appear before the panel to be reprimanded. 
 
2.    the Registrar suspend Dr. Yeung's certificate of registration for a period of six (6) months, 
      to commence January 23, 2012.  
 
3.    the Registrar place the following terms, conditions and limitations on Dr. Yeung's 
      certificate of registration: 
      (i)   that Dr. Yeung shall successfully complete the College's Physician's Prescribing 
            Skills course and shall successfully complete an educational program in Ethics, 
            both no later than one (1) year from the date he commences practice in Ontario; 
      (ii)  that Dr. Yeung shall keep a log of all Narcotics Drugs and Narcotic Preparations 
            prescribed for a period of one (1) year ("Narcotics Log") from the date he 
            commences practice in Ontario;   
      (iii) that Dr. Yeung shall practice under a Clinical Supervisor acceptable to the College 
            for a period of one (1) year from the date he commences practice in Ontario; such 
            supervision shall take place in a setting(s) which is acceptable to the College, and 
            shall consist of, at minimum, monthly reviews of patient charts and of the 
            Narcotics Log for the first three (3) months; and, thereafter, at the discretion of the 
            Clinical Supervisor, quarterly reviews with quarterly reporting to the College 
            throughout the supervision period; and 
      (iv)  that Dr. Yeung will undergo an assessment of his practice, including his narcotics 
            prescribing, approximately one (1) year after the completion of the term of clinical 
            supervision set out in paragraph 3(iii). 
 
4.    Dr. Yeung pay costs to the College in the amount of $3,650 within thirty (30) days from 
      the date of this Order. 

Decision: Download Full Decision (PDF)
Appeal: No Appeal
Hearing Date(s): January 23, 2012

Concerns

Source: Member
Active Date: January 9, 2017
Expiry Date:
Summary:
Summary of the Undertaking given by Dr. Clement Ka-Chun Yeung to the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario effective January 9, 2017:

Dr. Yeung was the subject of an assessment by the College. As a result of the assessment:

• Dr. Yeung will practise under the guidance of a Clinical Supervisor for twelve (12) months; and
• Dr. Yeung’s practice will be reassessed by an assessor within three (3) months of the end of the period of Clinical Supervision.