Find A Doctor will be undergoing maintenance between 6:00pm on Friday, December 15, 2017 and 12:00 noon on Saturday, December 16, 2017. You may experience intermittent service interruptions during this time. We apologize for the inconvenience.

×Close

Yeung, Clement Wing Tai (CPSO#: 64109)

Current Status: Active Member as of 24 Jun 1992

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 24 Jun 1992

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Cantonese, Chinese, English, Mandarin

Education:University of Toronto, 1991

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 308
4800 Leslie Street
North York ON  M2J 2K9
Phone: (416) 496-0003
Fax: (416) 644-0222
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Clement Yeung Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Oct 22 2009

Shareholders:
Dr. C. Yeung ( CPSO# 64109 )

Business Address:
Suite 308
4800 Leslie Street
North York ON  M2J 2K9
Phone Number: (416) 496-0003

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. CLEMENT WING TAI YEUNG may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. YEUNG is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 17 Jun 1991
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 15 Jun 1992
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 24 Jun 1992