Yeung, Danny Shiu Chin (CPSO#: 56900)

Current Status: Active Member as of 16 Jun 1986

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 17 Aug 1987

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Cantonese, English

Education:University of Toronto, 1986

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
2830 Keele Street
Suite 402
Downsview ON  M3M 3E5
Phone: (416) 633-7337
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Danny Yeung Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jul 25 2017

Shareholders:
Dr. D. Yeung ( CPSO# 56900 )

Business Address:
402 - 2830 Keele Street
Downsview ON  M3M 3E5
Phone Number: (416) 633-7337

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Mount Sinai Hospital Toronto
North York General Hospital,General Division Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 01 Jul 1988 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. DANNY SHIU CHIN YEUNG may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. YEUNG is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 16 Jun 1986 to 15 Jun 1987
Other - Comprehensive Internship

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1987 to 30 Jun 1988
Resident 2 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1988 to 30 Jun 1989
Clinical Fellow - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 16 Jun 1986
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 17 Aug 1987