Yeung, Eugene Yiu Chung (CPSO#: 60595)

Current Status: Active Member as of 06 Apr 1989

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 31 Oct 1990

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of London, 1978

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Centenary Health Centre
Department Of Radiology
2867 Ellesmere Road
Scarborough ON  M1E 4B9
Phone: (416) 284-8131 Ext. 4140
Electoral District: 10
Find more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

The Scarborough Hospital
Birchmount Campus
3030 Birchmount Road
Scarborough ON  M1W 3W3
Canada
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Eugene Yeung Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  May 15 2006

Shareholders:
Dr. E. Yeung ( CPSO# 60595 )

Business Address:
580 Harwood Avenue South
Ajax ON  L1S 2J9
Phone Number: (905) 683-2320

Business Address:
3030 Birchmount Road
Scarborough ON  M1W 3W3
Phone Number: (416) 495-2480

Business Address:
2867 Ellesmere Road
Scarborough ON  M1E 4B9
Phone Number: (416) 281-7021

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

Hong Kong S A R
United Kingdom

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Lakeridge Health,Ajax and Pickering Site Ajax
Muskoka Algonquin Health Care,South Muskoka Memorial Site Bracebridge
Muskoka Algonquin Healthcare,Huntsville District Memorial Hospital Huntsville
Rouge Valley Centenary Health Centre,Toronto Toronto
Scarborough Hospital-Birchmount Campus Toronto
West Parry Sound Health Centre Parry Sound

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Diagnostic Radiology Effective: 22 Nov 1989 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. EUGENE YIU CHUNG YEUNG may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. YEUNG is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Academic Practice Certificate Effective: 06 Apr 1989
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 31 Oct 1990