Yorston, Janet Elizabeth (CPSO#: 32523)

Current Status: Active Member as of 25 Oct 1983

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 25 Oct 1983

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McMaster University, 1978

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Box 744
Madoc ON  K0K 2K0
Phone: (613) 473-0867
Electoral District: 06
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: J. E. Yorston Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Mar 1 2017

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 01 Jul 1981 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. JANET ELIZABETH YORSTON may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. YORSTON is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1978
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 1980
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 23 Jun 1981
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 19 Jun 1982
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 25 Oct 1983