Young, Gordon Bryan (CPSO#: 32799)

Current Status: Active Member as of 24 Aug 1981

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 24 Aug 1981

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Saskatchewan, 1970

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Grey Bruce Health Services
Suite 7208
1800 8th Street East
Owen Sound ON  N4K 6M9
Phone: (519) 371-5809
Fax: (519) 371-0404
Electoral District: 03
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: G. Bryan Young Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jun 18 2015

Shareholders:
Dr. G. Young ( CPSO# 32799 )

Business Address:
Grey Bruce Health Services
Suite 7208
1800 8th Street East
Owen Sound ON  N4K 6M9
Phone Number: (519) 371-5809

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Grey Bruce Health Services,Owen Sound Owen Sound
London Health Sciences Centre South Street Hospital London
London Health Sciences Centre Victoria Hospital London
London Health Sciences Centre,University Site London
St Joseph's Health Care-St Joseph's Site,London London

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Neurology Effective: 02 Dec 1977 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. GORDON BRYAN YOUNG may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. YOUNG is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1974
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 1978
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 24 Aug 1981