Young, Peter Gerard James (CPSO#: 69293)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1995

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2001

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 1995

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Perfect Reflections
Laser Skin Clinic
Huntington Square
8B-211 Martindale Road
St Catharines ON  L2S 3V7
Phone: (905) 988-6153
Fax: (905) 988-6298
Electoral District: 04
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: P.G.J. Young Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  May 09 2007

Shareholders:
Dr. P. Young ( CPSO# 69293 )

Business Address:
211 Martindale Road
St Catharines ON  L2S 3V7
Phone Number: (905) 988-6153

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Niagara Health System,St Catharines General Site St Catharines

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Plastic Surgery Effective: 30 Jun 2001 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. PETER GERARD JAMES YOUNG may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. YOUNG is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
PostGrad Yr 1 - Plastic Surgery

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
PostGrad Yr 2 - Plastic Surgery

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
PostGrad Yr 3 - Plastic Surgery

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
PostGrad Yr 4 - Plastic Surgery

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1999 to 30 Jun 2000
PostGrad Yr 5 - Plastic Surgery

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2000 to 30 Jun 2001
PostGrad Yr 5 - Plastic Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1995
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2001