Young, Rebekka Bernardina (CPSO#: 54022)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1984

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 23 Jun 1986

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Queen's University, 1984

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
23 Marley Street
Kingston ON  K7M 2M4
Phone: (613) 546-4566
Fax: (613) 546-0935
Electoral District: 06
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Rebekka Young Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Nov 11 2014

Shareholders:
Dr. R. Young ( CPSO# 54022 )

Business Address:
23 Marley Street
Kingston ON  K7M 2M4
Phone Number: (613) 546-4566

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. REBEKKA BERNARDINA YOUNG may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. YOUNG is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

Queen's University, 01 Jul 1984 to 30 Jun 1985
Other - Comprehensive Internship

Queen's University, 01 Jul 1985 to 30 Jun 1986
Resident 1 - Family Medicine

Queen's University, 01 Jul 1986 to 30 Jun 1987
Resident 2 - Psychiatry

Queen's University, 01 Jul 1987 to 30 Jun 1988
Resident 3 - Psychiatry

Queen's University, 01 Jul 1988 to 30 Jun 1989
Resident 4 - Psychiatry

Queen's University, 01 Jul 1989 to 30 Jun 1990
Resident 4 - Psychiatry

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1984
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 23 Jun 1986