Young, Scott Donald (CPSO#: 66516)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1993

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 19 Sep 1997

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1993

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
N E Ont Regional Cancer Centre
41 Ramsey Lake Road
Sudbury ON  P3E 5J1
Phone: (705) 522-6237 Ext. 2301
Electoral District: 08
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Scott D. Young Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Feb 14 2008

Shareholders:
Dr. S. Young ( CPSO# 66516 )

Business Address:
Laurentian Hospital
N E Ont Regional Cancer Centre
41 Ramsey Lake Road
Sudbury ON  P3E 5J1
Phone Number: (705) 522-6237

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Health Sciences North Sudbury

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 11 Jun 1997 RCPSC Specialist
Medical Oncology Effective: 10 Sep 1998 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. SCOTT DONALD YOUNG may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. YOUNG is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1993 to 30 Jun 1994
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1994 to 30 Jun 1995
Resident 3 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
Resident 4 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
Resident 5 - Medical Oncology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
Resident 5 - Medical Oncology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
Clinical Fellow - Medical Oncology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1993
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 19 Sep 1997