Young, Sherylan (CPSO#: 68216)

Current Status: Active Member as of 18 Jul 1996

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 18 Jul 1996

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1994

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Dept of Family & Community Medicine
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre
Room A102
2075 Bayview Avenue
Toronto ON  M4N 3M5
Phone: (416) 480-4931
Fax: (416) 480-6038
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Sherylan Young Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Dec 21 2012

Shareholders:
Dr. S. Young ( CPSO# 68216 )

Business Address:
Dept of Family & Community Medicine
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre
Room A102
2075 Bayview Avenue
Toronto ON  M4N 3M5
Phone Number: (416) 480-4931

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Mount Sinai Hospital Toronto
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 04 Jun 1996 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. SHERYLAN YOUNG may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. YOUNG is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1994 to 30 Jun 1995
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1994
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 1996
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 18 Jul 1996