Yousef, Osama Abdulhamid Emhemad (CPSO#: 76818)

Current Status: Active Member as of 15 Sep 2009

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 15 Sep 2009

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Arabic, English

Education:University of Al Fateh, 1997

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Grand River Hospital
Department of Diagnostic Radiology
PO Box 9056
835 King Street
Kitchener ON  N2G 1G3
Phone: (519) 749-4300 Ext. 5144
Electoral District: 03
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Osama Yousef Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jan 22 2008

Shareholders:
Dr. E. Youssef ( CPSO# 81832 )
Dr. O. Yousef ( CPSO# 76818 )

Business Address:
379 Red Osier Road
Waterloo ON  N2V 2W1
Phone Number: (519) 208-9277

Business Address:
Grand River Hospital
835 King Street West
Kitchener ON  N2G 2G3
Phone Number: (519) 749-4300

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Diagnostic Radiology Effective: 07 May 2007 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. OSAMA ABDULHAMID EMHEMAD YOUSEF may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. YOUSEF is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
PostGrad Yr 1 - Diagnostic Radiology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
PostGrad Yr 2 - Diagnostic Radiology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
PostGrad Yr 3 - Diagnostic Radiology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 4 - Diagnostic Radiology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 5 - Diagnostic Radiology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
Clinical Fellow - Diagnostic Radiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 05 Jul 2001
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2007
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 13 Jul 2007
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 24 Apr 2009
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 15 Sep 2009