Youssef, Elham AB Ali (CPSO#: 81832)

Current Status: Active Member as of 16 Jan 2007

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 16 Jan 2007

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: Arabic, English

Education:University of Al Fateh, 2001

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
450 Westheights Dr., Unit 11
Kitchener ON  N2N 2B9
Phone: (519) 725-4070
Fax: (519) 725-4071
Electoral District: 03
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

75 University Ave. West
Waterloo ON  N2L 3C5
Canada
Phone: (519) 884-0710 Ext. 3146
County: Regional Municipality of Waterloo
Electoral District: 03
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Osama Yousef Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jan 22 2008

Shareholders:
Dr. O. Yousef ( CPSO# 76818 )
Dr. E. Youssef ( CPSO# 81832 )

Business Address:
Grand River Hospital
835 King Street West
Kitchener ON  N2G 2G3
Phone Number: (519) 749-4300

Business Address:
379 Red Osier Road
Waterloo ON  N2V 2W1
Phone Number: (519) 208-9277


Corporation Name: Elham Youssef Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jan 22 2008

Shareholders:
Dr. E. Youssef ( CPSO# 81832 )

Business Address:
Suite 11
450 Westheights Drive
Kitchener ON  N2N 2B9
Phone Number: (519) 725-4070

Business Address:
Wilfred Laurier University
75 University Avenue West
Waterloo ON  N2L 3C5
Phone Number: (519) 884-0710

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 06 Dec 2006 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ELHAM AB ALI YOUSSEF may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. YOUSSEF is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 24 Aug 2004 to 18 Oct 2004
PEAP - Resident - Family Medicine

University of Ottawa, 19 Oct 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2005 to 15 Nov 2005
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Ottawa, 16 Nov 2005 to 23 Oct 2006
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 24 Aug 2004
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 21 Oct 2004
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 23 Oct 2006
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 16 Jan 2007