Yousuf, Kashif Abdul H (CPSO#: 84351)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2006

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 31 Aug 2011

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McMaster University, 2006

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Windsor Regional Hospital Ouellette
1030 Ouellette Avenue
Windsor ON  N9A 1E1
Phone: (519) 973-4421
Electoral District: 01
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Windsor Regional Hospital Metropol
1995 Lens Avenue
Windsor ON  N8W 1L9
Canada
Phone: (519) 254-5577
County: County of Essex
Electoral District: 01
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Kashif Yousuf Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Nov 30 2011

Shareholders:
Dr. K. Yousuf ( CPSO# 84351 )

Business Address:
1030 Ouellette Avenue
Windsor ON  N9A 1E1
Phone Number: (519) 973-4421

Business Address:
1995 Lens Avenue
Windsor ON  N8W 1L9
Phone Number: (519) 254-5577

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Windsor Regional Hospital,Metropolitan Site Windsor
Windsor Regional Hospital,Ouellette Campus Windsor

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Anesthesiology Effective: 31 Aug 2011 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. KASHIF ABDUL H YOUSUF may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. YOUSUF is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2006 to 28 Feb 2007
PostGrad Yr 1 - Community Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Mar 2007 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 1 - Anesthesiology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 2 - Anesthesiology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 3 - Anesthesiology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2009 to 23 Sep 2009
PostGrad Yr 3 - Anesthesiology

McMaster University, 24 Sep 2009 to 23 Sep 2010
PostGrad Yr 4 - Anesthesiology

McMaster University, 24 Sep 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 5 - Anesthesiology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2011 to 31 Aug 2011
PostGrad Yr 5 - Anesthesiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2006
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 31 Aug 2011