Yu, Chun Ming (CPSO#: 94509)

Current Status: Active Member as of 24 Oct 2012

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 24 Oct 2012

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: Chinese, English

Education:Shanghai Medical University, 1993

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 408
430 The Boardwalk
Waterloo ON  N2J 3Z4
Phone: (519) 744-2592
Fax: (519) 744-1197
Electoral District: 03
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Chun Ming Yu Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jan 09 2013

Shareholders:
Dr. C. Yu ( CPSO# 94509 )

Business Address:
Suite 408
430 The Boardwalk
Waterloo ON  N2T 0C1
Phone Number: (519) 744-2592

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 10 Oct 2012 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. CHUN MING YU may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. YU is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 19 Oct 2010 to 11 Jan 2011
Assessment Verification Period - Family Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 12 Jan 2011 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2011 to 18 Oct 2011
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 19 Oct 2011 to 18 Oct 2012
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 19 Oct 2010
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 12 Jan 2011
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 18 Oct 2012
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 24 Oct 2012