Yu, Horace (CPSO#: 92952)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2010

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 26 Jul 2012

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Cantonese, English

Education:University of Calgary, 2010

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
PO Box 481
Manotick ON  K4M 1A5
Phone: (613) 8237766
Fax: (613) 6925589
Electoral District: 07
Find more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

3161 Strandherd Drive
Ottawa ON  K2J 4V1
Canada
Phone: 6138237766
County: Regional Municipality of Ottawa-Carleton
Electoral District: 07

566 Louise St
Winchester ON  K0C 2K0
Canada
County: County of Stormont, Dundas and Glengarry
Electoral District: 07

60 Cornelia St W
Smiths Falls ON  K7A 2H9
Canada
County: County of Lanark
Electoral District: 07

211 Lake Avenue East
Carleton Place ON  K7C 1J4
Canada
County: County of Lanark
Electoral District: 07
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Horace Yu Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jan 11 2013

Shareholders:
Dr. H. Yu ( CPSO# 92952 )

Business Address:
60 Cornelia Street West
Smiths Falls ON  K7A 2H9

Business Address:
3045 Baseline Road
Ottawa ON  K2H 8P4

Business Address:
PO Box 481
Manotick ON  K4M 1A5
Phone Number: (613) 823-7766

Business Address:
211 Lake Avenue East
Carleton Place ON  K7C 1J4

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Carleton Place & District Memorial Hospital Carleton Place
Perth and Smiths Falls District Hospital,Smiths Falls Community Site Smiths Falls
Queensway Carleton Hospital Ottawa
Winchester District Memorial Hospital Winchester

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 19 Jul 2012 CFPC Specialist
Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine) Effective: 06 Oct 2016 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. HORACE YU may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. YU is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2011 to 01 Aug 2011
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

Queen's University, 02 Aug 2011 to 30 Jul 2012
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Queen's University, 31 Jul 2012 to 22 Oct 2012
PostGrad Yr 3 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2010
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 26 Jul 2012