Find A Doctor will be undergoing maintenance between 6:00pm on Friday, December 15, 2017 and 12:00 noon on Saturday, December 16, 2017. You may experience intermittent service interruptions during this time. We apologize for the inconvenience.

×Close

Yucel, Yeni Hasan (CPSO#: 65714)

Current Status: Active Member as of 28 Jul 1998

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 28 Jul 1998

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French, Turkish

Education:Universite de Louis Pasteur, 1985

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Laboratory Medicine & Pathobiology
St Michael's Hospital
209 LKSKI Room 409
30 Bond Street
Toronto ON  M5B 1W8
Phone: (416) 864-6060 Ext. 77594
Fax: (416) 864-5648
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Drs. Gupta and Yucel Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Aug 24 2009

Shareholders:
Dr. N. Gupta ( CPSO# 64236 )
Dr. Y. Yucel ( CPSO# 65714 )

Business Address:
St Michael's Hospital
30 Bond Street
Cardinal Carter Wing
Suite 8-072
Toronto ON  M5B 1W8
Phone Number: (416) 864-5444

Business Address:
St Michael's Hospital
30 Bond Street
209 LKSKI, Room 409
Toronto ON  M5B 1W8
Phone Number: (416) 864-6060

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
St Michael's Hospital Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Neuropathology Effective: 30 Jun 1995 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. YENI HASAN YUCEL may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. YUCEL is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1992 to 30 Jun 1993
Resident 1 - Anatomical Pathology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1993 to 30 Jun 1994
Resident 2 - Neuropathology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1994 to 30 Jun 1995
Resident 4 - Neuropathology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
Resident 5 - Anatomical Pathology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1992
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 1996
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 28 Jul 1998