Yuen, Kenneth Wing Hon (CPSO#: 66666)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1993

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 04 Jul 1997

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Cantonese, English

Education:University of Toronto, 1993

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 307
1 Quarry Ridge Road
Barrie ON  L4M 7G1
Phone: (705) 792-6593
Fax: (705) 792-4325
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Kenneth Yuen Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  May 24 2011

Shareholders:
Dr. K. Yuen ( CPSO# 66666 )

Business Address:
Suite 307
1 Quarry Ridge Road
Barrie ON  L4M 7G1
Phone Number: (705) 792-6593

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 1997 RCPSC Specialist
Rheumatology Effective: 22 Nov 1998 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. KENNETH WING HON YUEN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. YUEN is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1993 to 30 Jun 1994
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1994 to 30 Jun 1995
Resident 2 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
Resident 3 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
Resident 4 - Rheumatology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
Resident 5 - Rheumatology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
PostGrad Yr 5 - Clinician Investigator

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1999 to 30 Jun 2000
PostGrad Yr 5 - Clinician Investigator

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2000 to 30 Jun 2001
PostGrad Yr 5 - Clinician Investigator

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
PostGrad Yr 6 - Clinician Investigator

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1993
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 04 Jul 1997