Yung, Wingko Wilson (CPSO#: 53899)

Current Status: Active Member as of 11 Jun 1984

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 25 Jun 1985

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Chinese, English

Education:University of Toronto, 1984

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Department of Anaesthesia
Mackenziehealth
10 Trench Street
Richmond Hill ON  L4C 4Z3
Phone: (905) 883-2110
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Wingko W. Yung Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jun 23 2006

Shareholders:
Dr. W. Yung ( CPSO# 53899 )

Business Address:
10 Trench Street
Richmond Hill ON  L4C 4Z3
Phone Number: (905) 883-2110

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Mackenzie Health,Richmond Hill Richmond Hill

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Anesthesiology Effective: 07 Jun 1990 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. WINGKO WILSON YUNG may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. YUNG is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 11 Jun 1984 to 17 Jun 1985
Other - Rotating Internship

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1986 to 30 Jun 1987
Resident 1 - Anesthesiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1987 to 30 Jun 1988
Resident 2 - Anesthesiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1988 to 30 Jun 1989
Resident 3 - Anesthesiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1989 to 30 Jun 1990
Resident 4 - Anesthesiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 11 Jun 1984
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 25 Jun 1985