Zabel, Werner Ralph (CPSO#: 52659)

Current Status: Active Member as of 22 Aug 1990

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 22 Aug 1990

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, German

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 1983

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
1 Centrepointe Drive
Suite 202
Nepean ON  K2G 3E2
Phone: (613) 226-8991
Fax: (613) 226-2803
Electoral District: 07
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: R. Zabel Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Apr 27 2004

Shareholders:
Dr. W. Zabel ( CPSO# 52659 )

Business Address:
202 - 1 Centrepointe Drive
Ottawa ON  K2G 6E2
Phone Number: (613) 226-2070

Business Address:
1967 Riverside Drive
Ottawa ON  K1H 7W9
Phone Number: (613) 748-7100

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Ottawa Hospital,Civic Site Ottawa
Ottawa Hospital,General Site Ottawa
Ottawa Hospital,Riverside Site Ottawa
Perth and Smiths Falls District Hospital,Smiths Falls Community Site Smiths Falls

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Ophthalmology Effective: 27 Nov 1987 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. WERNER RALPH ZABEL may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ZABEL is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1983
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 1987
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 22 Aug 1990