Zafar, Aftab (CPSO#: 71241)

Current Status: Active Member as of 28 Jul 2004

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 28 Jul 2004

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Ottawa, 1997

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Sutie 201
148 Manitou Drive
Kitchener ON  N2C 1L3
Phone: (519) 954-5900
Fax: (519) 954-5339
Electoral District: 03
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: A. Zafar Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Mar 13 2008

Shareholders:
Dr. A. Zafar ( CPSO# 71241 )

Business Address:
Suite 201
148 Manitou Drive
Kitchener ON  N2C 1L3
Phone Number: (519) 954-5900

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Grand River Hospital Corporation,Kitchener Waterloo Site Kitchener
St Mary's General Hospital,Kitchener Kitchener

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Ophthalmology Effective: 13 Jun 2004 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. AFTAB ZAFAR may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ZAFAR is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
Clinical Fellow - Ophthalmology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2003 to 31 Aug 2003
Clinical Fellow - Ophthalmology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1997
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 1999
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2002
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 Aug 2003
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 28 Jul 2004