Zaher, Amjad Nizameddin (CPSO#: 60278)

Current Status: Active Member as of 20 Dec 1995

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 20 Dec 1995

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Arabic, English

Education:University of Damascus, 1984

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite A
1909 Tecumseh Road East
Windsor ON  N8W 1C9
Phone: (519) 258-7671
Fax: (519) 258-9281
Electoral District: 01
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Zaher Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Dec 07 2010

Shareholders:
Dr. A. Zaher ( CPSO# 60278 )

Business Address:
Suite A
1909 Tecumseh Road East
Windsor ON  N8W 1C9
Phone Number: (519) 258-7671

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Windsor Regional Hospital,Metropolitan Site Windsor

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Pediatrics Effective: 23 Nov 1992 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. AMJAD NIZAMEDDIN ZAHER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ZAHER is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1988 to 30 Jun 1989
Resident 1 - Pediatrics

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1989 to 30 Jun 1990
Resident 2 - Pediatrics

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1990 to 30 Jun 1991
Resident 3 - Pediatrics

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 31 Aug 1988
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 1991
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 20 Dec 1995