Find A Doctor will be undergoing maintenance between 6:00pm on Friday, December 15, 2017 and 12:00 noon on Saturday, December 16, 2017. You may experience intermittent service interruptions during this time. We apologize for the inconvenience.

×Close

Zahlan, Usama (CPSO#: 69727)

Current Status: Active Member as of 02 Jan 1996

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 02 Jan 1996

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Arabic, English

Education:University of Medicine and Pharmacy, 1982

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Lake Of The Woods District Hospital
21 Sylvan Street
Kenora ON  P9N 3W7
Phone: (807) 468-9861 Ext. 2262
Fax: (807) 468-1428
Electoral District: 09
Find more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Kenora District ACT Team Connection
2nd Floor
227 Second Street
CMHA Kenora
Kenora ON  P9N 1G1
Canada
Phone: (807) 468-4215
Fax: (807) 468-6446
County: District of Kenora
Electoral District: 09
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. U. Zahlan Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Dec 19 2006

Shareholders:
Dr. U. Zahlan ( CPSO# 69727 )

Business Address:
Lake of the Woods District Hospital
21 Sylvan Street
Kenora ON  P9N 3W7
Phone Number: (807) 468-9861

Business Address:
CMHA - Kenora Branch
227 Second Street South
Kenora ON  P9N 1G1
Phone Number: (807) 468-4215

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Dryden Regional Health Centre Dryden
Lake of the Woods District Hospital Kenora

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective: 31 Dec 1995 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. USAMA ZAHLAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ZAHLAN is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 02 Jan 1996