Zajc-Dalcourt, Natasha (CPSO#: 68215)

Current Status: Active Member as of 04 Jul 1996

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 04 Jul 1996


Former Name: Zajc, Natasha (used until: 25 Jan 2010 )

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1994

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 205
531 Davis Drive
Newmarket ON  L3Y 6P5
Phone: (905) 853-8966
Fax: (905) 853-2953
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Zajc-Dalcourt Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jan 21 2010

Dr. N. Zajc-Dalcourt ( CPSO# 68215 )

Business Address:
Suite 205
531 Davis Drive
Newmarket ON  L3Y 6P5
Phone Number: (905) 853-8966

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Southlake Regional Health Centre Newmarket


Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 04 Jun 1996 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions


(1) Dr. NATASHA ZAJC-DALCOURT may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ZAJC-DALCOURT is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1994 to 30 Jun 1995
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1994
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 1996
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 04 Jul 1996