Zajdman, Michael Lucian (CPSO#: 56694)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1986

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 03 Apr 1987

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McGill University, 1985

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
2227 South Millway
Suite 301
Mississauga ON  L5L 3R6
Phone: (905) 569-9798
Fax: (905) 569-8630
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Michael L. Zajdman Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Aug 17 2009

Shareholders:
Dr. M. Zajdman ( CPSO# 56694 )

Business Address:
Suite 301
2227 South Millway
Mississauga ON  L5L 3R6
Phone Number: (905) 569-9798

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Trillium Health Partners,The Credit Valley Hospital Mississauga

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Pediatrics Effective: 28 May 1990 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. MICHAEL LUCIAN ZAJDMAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ZAJDMAN is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1989 to 30 Jun 1990
Resident 4 - Pediatrics

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1986
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 03 Apr 1987