Zalzal, Paul Kerim (CPSO#: 70035)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1996

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2001

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:McMaster University, 1996

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite A34
481 North Service Road West
Oakville ON  L6M 2V6
Phone: (905) 844-7706
Fax: (905) 844-7808
Electoral District: 04
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Paul Zalzal Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Aug 23 2011

Shareholders:
Dr. P. Zalzal ( CPSO# 70035 )

Business Address:
Suite A-34
481 North Service Road West
Oakville ON  L6M 2V6
Phone Number: (905) 844-7706

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Halton Healthcare Services Corporation,Georgetown Hospital Georgetown
Milton Site Halton Healthcare Services Milton
Oakville Trafalgar Memorial Hospital Oakville

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Orthopedic Surgery Effective: 30 Jun 2001 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. PAUL KERIM ZALZAL may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ZALZAL is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
PostGrad Yr 1 - Orthopedic Surgery

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
PostGrad Yr 2 - Orthopedic Surgery

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
PostGrad Yr 3 - Orthopedic Surgery

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1999 to 30 Jun 2000
PostGrad Yr 4 - Orthopedic Surgery

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2000 to 30 Jun 2001
PostGrad Yr 5 - Orthopedic Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
Clinical Fellow - Orthopedic Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2003 to 31 Dec 2003
Clinical Fellow - Orthopedic Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1996
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2001