Zanetti, Fabio Gregorio (CPSO#: 59006)

Current Status: Active Member as of 22 Sep 1987

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 22 Sep 1987

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French, Italian

Education:University of Ottawa, 1986

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
North Brantford Professional
Building
Unit 6
525 Park Road North
Brantford ON  N3R 7K8
Phone: (519) 752-7978
Fax: (519) 752-7452
Electoral District: 04
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: FG Zanetti Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jul 05 2005

Shareholders:
Dr. F. Zanetti ( CPSO# 59006 )

Business Address:
North Brantford Professional
Building
Unit 6
525 Park Road North
Brantford ON  N3R 7K8
Phone Number: (519) 752-7978

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Brant Community Healthcare System Brantford

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Ophthalmology Effective: 19 Nov 1992 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. FABIO GREGORIO ZANETTI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ZANETTI is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1991 to 30 Jun 1992
Resident 4 - Ophthalmology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 22 Sep 1987